UT HB0442 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Board of Education Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Education Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-27 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2023-02-27HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed
2023-02-27HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House file for bills not passed
2023-02-27HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2023-02-27HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2023-02-27HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-27HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-24HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-23HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee
2023-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee
2023-02-17HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2023-02-16HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2023-02-13HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2023-02-10 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-02-10 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53E2301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback