UT HB0429 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Employment Revisions
Title
State Employment Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Division of Human Resource Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor and Employment
State Officers and Employees
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor and Employment
State Officers and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63A | 17 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 17 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 17 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 17 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 17 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |