UT HB0425 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Budgetary Procedures Act - Fee Amendments
Title
Budgetary Procedures Act - Fee Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Bigelow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in LRGC | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0425.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0425.pdf |