UT HB0419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Control and Signage At State Stores
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control and Signage At State Stores
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-03-01 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-24 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-24 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-22 | House Comm - Held in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |