UT HB0410 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol and Substance Use Withdrawal in County Jails
Title
Alcohol and Substance Use Withdrawal in County Jails
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |