UT HB0398 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substance Use and Health Care Amendments
Title
Substance Use and Health Care Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ floor amendment # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ floor amendment # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Counties
Health Care
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Inmates
Mental Health
Mental Health Professional
Substance Abuse
Suicide
Counties
Health Care
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Inmates
Mental Health
Mental Health Professional
Substance Abuse
Suicide