UT HB0398 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Planning Districts Amendments
Title
Planning Districts Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0398.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0398.pdf |