UT HB0394 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor and Special Fuel Tax Act Amendments
Title
Motor and Special Fuel Tax Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTREV | |
2010-02-23 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-19 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0394.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0394.pdf |