UT HB0393 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advertisements on School Buses
Title
Advertisements on School Buses
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Bird [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-03-03 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU | |
2010-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-11 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |