UT HB0388 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abusive Conduct Reporting Amendments
Title
Abusive Conduct Reporting Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |