UT HB0372 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Electrician Licensing Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrician Licensing Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2015-03-12 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2015-03-12 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2015-03-12SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2015-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2015-03-12SenateSenate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-03-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2015-03-09SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2015-03-09SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2015-03-02SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2015-03-02 Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-03-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2015-03-02SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2015-03-02HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-02-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Business and Labor Committee
2015-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2015-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2015-02-24HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2015-02-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2015-02-23 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2015-02-23 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2015-02-22 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-20 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback