UT HB0372 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Utah Code - Official Version

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utah Code - Official Version

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-08 House/ filed in HFILE
2012-03-08 House/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2012-03-08 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2012-03-08 Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2012-02-28 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2012-02-28 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2012-02-28 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2012-02-28 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2012-02-28 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2012-02-17 House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2012-02-17 House/ committee report favorable in HSTPOL
2012-02-17 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL
2012-02-13 House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL
2012-02-10 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2012-02-10 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2012-02-10 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2012-02-10 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2012-02-10 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2012-02-10 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-02-10 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-02-10 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2012-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2012-02-04 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-02-03 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback