UT HB0371 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic Beverage Control Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-04 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-03HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-03HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-25SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-25SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-24HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-02-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32B1102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B1607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B11202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B12205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B4403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B4404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B5310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B61004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B6703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B8501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63G4102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7739101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0371.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0371.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0371S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0371S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillenr/HB0371.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0371s02.hca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0371s02.sca.02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0371S01_ComparedWith_HB0371.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0371S02_ComparedWith_HB0371S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0371S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20153
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20155
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20159
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=743&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20596
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1344&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback