UT HB0371 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Autonomous Vehicle Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicle Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-02-23HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-22HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-21HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-21HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee
2018-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
2018-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Transportation Committee
2018-02-16HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-02-12 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback