UT HB0361 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Restitution Amendments
Title
Criminal Restitution Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Restitution
Criminal Procedure
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Restitution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
77 | 18 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 18 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 18 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0361.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0361.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0361.fn.pdf |