UT HB0361 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Personal Injury Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Injury Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-03-23HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-03-12SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2020-03-09SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Consent Calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-03-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-03-06SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-05HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-05HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee
2020-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2020-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0361.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0361.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0361.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0361S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillenr/HB0361.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0361.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0361S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16620
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16621
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=844&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16963
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16966
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16967
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1510&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1172&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback