UT HB0357S01 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB0357

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Budgetary Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budgetary Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-02 Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV
2014-03-21 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2014-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-11 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-11 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-11HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-11HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-11HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-11SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in SSTBUS
2014-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS
2014-03-06SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS
2014-03-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-06SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2014-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ substituted in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB
2014-02-25HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2014-02-25HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS
2014-02-24HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTHHS
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-02-17 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0357 (Replaces) 2014-03-05 - House/ substituted in HSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback