UT HB0357 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Written Agreement Amendments
Title
Written Agreement Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House/ failed (Y: 30 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |