UT HB0356 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Athletic Coaching Standards Amendments
Title
Athletic Coaching Standards Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House/ failed (Y: 31 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House/ failed (Y: 31 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
K-12 Education
School Districts
School Personnel
State Board of Education
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
K-12 Education
School Districts
School Personnel
State Board of Education