UT HB0355 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Data Research Center Amendments
Title
Utah Data Research Center Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate Consent Calendar |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-14 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-09 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Boards and Committees
Commerce and Trade
Department of Commerce
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Commerce and Trade
Department of Commerce
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53B | 33 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 33 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 33 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |