UT HB0354 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County Regulatory Amendments
Title
County Regulatory Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |