UT HB0354 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Act
Title
Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Airports
Business
Local Governments
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation Network Company
Business
Local Governments
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation Network Company