UT HB0353 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion Freedom of Conscience
Title
Abortion Freedom of Conscience
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-18 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-17 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |