UT HB0351 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Funding for Highway Projects - Salt Lake County
Title
Funding for Highway Projects - Salt Lake County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2010-03-08 | House/ passed 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-27 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |