UT HB0350 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - House/ filed in Clerk of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Impaired Driving Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impaired Driving Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseHouse/ filed in Clerk of the House
2020-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ failed in Senate Secretary
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-03-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28HouseHouse/ held in House Docket Clerk
2020-02-28SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-17 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0350.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0350.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0350S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0350S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0350S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0350.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0350S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0350S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16058
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16059
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=604&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16764
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16766
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1696&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback