UT HB0349 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ranked Choice Voting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ranked Choice Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2017-03-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee
2017-03-07SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-07SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-03-03SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-03SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-03-03HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-03-03HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-03-01HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-28HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-23HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-02-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-02-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback