UT HB0339 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Involuntary Commitment Amendments
Title
Involuntary Commitment Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Child Welfare
Civil Commitment
Department of Human Services
Division of Child and Family Services
Human Services
Mental Health
Civil Commitment
Department of Human Services
Division of Child and Family Services
Human Services
Mental Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62A | 15 | 629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 15 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 15 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 15 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 15 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |