UT HB0338 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District Voter Eligibility Amendments
Title
School District Voter Eligibility Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House/ failed (Y: 22 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Driver License
Education
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Driver License
Education
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 14 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 2 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 6 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |