UT HB0335 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Grant Process Amendments
Title
State Grant Process Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-16 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-15 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic Development
Government Operations (State Issues)
Grant Programs and Incentives
Public Funds and Accounts
Economic Development
Government Operations (State Issues)
Grant Programs and Incentives
Public Funds and Accounts
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65A | 16 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65A | 16 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65A | 16 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 2 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |