UT HB0325 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military Installation Development Authority Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Installation Development Authority Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-21 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-19HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2013-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-13 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-13HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-03-11SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDW
2013-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW
2013-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ lifted from standing committee in SSTGOP
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP
2013-03-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2013-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-01SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-01HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTPUT
2013-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT
2013-02-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTPUT
2013-02-21HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2013-02-21HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2013-02-20HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2013-02-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-19HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-02-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-15 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback