UT HB0324 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Workplace Violence Protective Orders Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workplace Violence Protective Orders Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-03 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-10HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-03-06 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-06 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-03 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-03-03SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-03SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-28SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-21SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary
2023-02-20SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary
2023-02-17SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-02-17SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-02-17HouseHouse/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-17HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-17HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-17HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-16HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-16HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee
2023-02-15HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2023-02-15HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Judiciary Committee
2023-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Judiciary Committee
2023-02-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2023-01-30HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-01-30HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2023-01-27 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-01-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
78B7102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0324.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324S02.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324S04.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillamd/HB0324S04.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillenr/HB0324.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/hb0324s04.sca.01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0324.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324S01_ComparedWith_HB0324.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0324S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324S02_ComparedWith_HB0324.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0324S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0324S04_ComparedWith_HB0324S02.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0324S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27448
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27449
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=766&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27981
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27983
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=2067&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1670&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback