UT HB0320 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Enterprise Zone Tax Credit Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zone Tax Credit Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-25SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ held in House Docket Clerk
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-12HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-09HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-02-09HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-02-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59101037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63N2213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback