UT HB0318S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0318
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Classroom Size Revisions
Title
Classroom Size Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2013-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTEDU |
2013-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2013-03-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTEDU |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTEDU |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0318 (Replaces) 2013-03-05 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB