UT HB0317 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent Domain Amendments
Title
Eminent Domain Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Department of Transportation
Eminent Domain
Government Operations (State Issues)
Land Use
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation
Department of Transportation
Eminent Domain
Government Operations (State Issues)
Land Use
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 5 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 6 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 6 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0317.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0317.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0317.pna.pdf |