UT HB0310 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Campaign Finance Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance Modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2021-03-02HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2021-03-02HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-02-06HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-02-05HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-02-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20A111005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A111301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A111502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A111704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A11905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A12303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback