UT HB0305 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Post Disaster Recovery and Mitigation Restricted Account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post Disaster Recovery and Mitigation Restricted Account

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2019-03-22 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2019-03-22HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2019-03-22HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-15 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-15 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-14 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2019-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2019-03-14HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2019-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-14SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2019-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-13HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2019-03-13HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-12SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2019-03-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-12SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-05SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-05SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-26SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-26SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-21HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-02-08 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-08 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0305.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0305.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0305S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillamd/HB0305S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillenr/HB0305.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0305.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0305S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0305S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=11622
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=11623
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=11624
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=519&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12553
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=1368&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=1560&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=1208&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback