UT HB0304 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fossil Fuels Tax Amendments
Title
Fossil Fuels Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Corporate Tax
Electricity
Energy
Environmental Quality
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Motor Fuel and Special Fuel Taxes
Natural Gas
Oil and Gas
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Electricity
Energy
Environmental Quality
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Motor Fuel and Special Fuel Taxes
Natural Gas
Oil and Gas
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax