UT HB0297 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State School Board Elections Amendments
Title
State School Board Elections Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House Comm - Held in House Education Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |