UT HB0294 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health System Reform Amendments
Title
Health System Reform Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-03 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-03 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-02 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-16 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-08 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-05 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-04 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-04 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |