UT HB0289 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tinted Vehicle Windows Amendments
Title
Tinted Vehicle Windows Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Lyman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |