UT HB0283S03 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0283S01
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit Entity Receipt of Government Money
Title
Nonprofit Entity Receipt of Government Money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ amended out amendment (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ amended out amendment (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-19 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ recalled by House in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ amended out amendment in S3RD |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP |
2014-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP |
2014-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSTGOC |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0283S01 (Replaces) 2014-02-25 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB