UT HB0280 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technical Revisions to Pawnshop Statute
Title
Technical Revisions to Pawnshop Statute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-29 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in SCON |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in SCON |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW |
2014-02-12 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2014-02-12 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |