UT HB0272 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Storage Amendments
Title
Energy Storage Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Held in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Electricity
Energy
Energy Storage
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Public Utilities
Public Utilities and Technology
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Sales Tax Exemptions
Energy
Energy Storage
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Public Utilities
Public Utilities and Technology
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Sales Tax Exemptions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 12 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 279 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 6 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |