UT HB0270S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0270S02
Note: Replaces legislation HB0270
Note: Replaces legislation HB0270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug Database Access Amendments
Title
Prescription Drug Database Access Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSUB |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTHHS |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTHHS |
2013-02-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-01-29 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTHHS |
2013-01-29 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0270S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
HB0270 (Replaces) 2013-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
HB0270 (Replaces) 2013-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB