UT HB0269 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Credit Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credit Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01 Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-03-23 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-03-23HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-04SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-28SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-28HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-28HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-07HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-07HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-06 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0269.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0269.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0269S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0269S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillenr/HB0269.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0269.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0269S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0269S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15939
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15941
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16107
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16108
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=620&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16605
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1549&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback