UT HB0268 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax and Fee Revisions
Title
Tax and Fee Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-20 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-20 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-12 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-07 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2019-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |