UT HB0267S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0267
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aging and Adult Services Amendments
Title
Aging and Adult Services Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTHHS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-18 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2014-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-11 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS |
2014-02-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2014-01-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0267 (Replaces) 2014-02-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB