UT HB0267 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Importation Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Importation Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2019-03-11SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-11SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-11SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-11SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08SenateSenate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-28SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-28SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-02-28HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-25HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-25HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback