UT HB0267 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Body Rules of Procedure
Title
Public Body Rules of Procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-09 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-04 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
County Government
Education
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Education
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0267.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0267.pdf |