UT HB0266 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Trauma-informed Research and Training Grant Program
Title
Trauma-informed Research and Training Grant Program
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Hawkins [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |